OR SB818 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to study and make recommendations regarding ratification of advance directive form adopted by Advance Directive Adoption Committee. Directs Oregon Health Authority to study and make recommendations regarding ratification of advance directive form adopted by Advance Directive Adoption Committee. Requires authority to submit report on findings to Legislative Assembly by January 1, 2023. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to ratification of advance directive form adopted by Advance Directive Adoption Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB818 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB818/Introduced |