OR SB818 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to open field offices to public on Saturdays. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the hours of operation at Department of Transportation field offices; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB818 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB818/Introduced |