OR SB815 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Land Conservation and Development Commission to request information from state agencies to update state agency coordination program by September 15, 2017. Requires state agencies to provide information requested by commission to Department of Land Conservation and Development. Requires commission to report progress on update to interim committee on land use by September 15, 2018. Requires commission to complete update of state agency coordination program by September 15, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to agency coordination; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB815 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB815/Introduced |