OR SB812 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies grant agreement requirements for Department of Environmental Quality grants to low-interest loan programs for on-site septic system repairs, replacements, upgrades and evaluations. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to on-site septic system financing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] |
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, June 6, 2017. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 255, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Boone, Hernandez, Keny-Guyer, McKeown, Smith G, Wilson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-04-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2017-03-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--DeBoer, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Carried over to 03-20 by unanimous consent. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |