OR SB81 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to Housing.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Corrects references for federal antipoverty programs delivered through community action agency network. Corrects references for federal antipoverty programs delivered through community action agency network.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to federal antipoverty programs.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Housing.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen.
2021-03-18SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback