OR SB81 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires tuition for certain courses offered at community college to be waived if person meets specified criteria. Requires that waiver be in form of grant. Places limitations on amounts waived. First applies to courses enrolled in for 2016-2017 academic year. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015] on passage.
Title
Relating to waiver of tuition for community college courses; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 48; Nays, 12--Barreto, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Smith Warner, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2015-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |