OR SB809 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Governor to review terms of Good Neighbor Authority Agreement. Requires Governor to work with United States Forest Service to give priority to projects expected to produce increased timber harvest volumes and greatest economic benefit to state. Requires Governor to report review and prioritization progress to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2018. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Good Neighbor Authority Agreement; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB809 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB809/Introduced |