OR SB806 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, May 30, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Effective date, May 30, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits obligor who is required to maintain life insurance policy to cover child support obligations to move court to modify portion of judgment requiring maintenance of life insurance policy under specified circumstances. Permits obligor who is required to maintain life insurance policy to cover child support obligations to move court to modify portion of judgment requiring maintenance of life insurance policy under specified circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage. .
Title
Relating to life insurance policies covering child support obligations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Senate | Effective date, May 30, 2023. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Chapter 139, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Conrad. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Gelser Blouin declared potential conflict of interest. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Frederick, Gorsek, Woods. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |