OR SB805 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Construction Contractors Board to establish voluntary certification program for residential general master builder of vertical homeownership structures and other structures and to define vertical homeowner structure by rule. Specifies length of period within which person or public body may bring action for construction defect in vertical homeownership structures as six years. Defines "vertical homeownership structure.] Permits Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt Vertical Homeownership Structure Code to govern construction of vertical homeownership structures. Requires department, if department establishes code, to also develop uniform permitting system and inspection checklist for vertical homeownership structures.] Transfers master builder program from Department of Consumer and Business Services to Construction Contractors Board and permits board to establish master builder certification program for vertical homeownership structures.] Permits State Board of Architect Examiners and State Board of Examiners for Engineering and Land Surveying to establish certification programs for architects and engineers that will design or participate in constructing vertical homeownership structures.] Becomes operative on January 1, 2022.] Permits Construction Contractors Board to establish voluntary certification program for residential general master builder of vertical homeownership structures and other structures and to define vertical homeowner structure by rule. Specifies minimum education and training requirements for master builder certification. Permits board to establish and charge fees to applicants for certification that are necessary to administer certification program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to vertical homeownership structures; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 413, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Robinson; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |