OR SB805 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Housing and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies length of period within which person or public body may bring action for construction defect in vertical homeownership structures as six years. Specifies length of period within which person or public body may bring action for construction defect in vertical homeownership structures as six years. Defines "vertical homeownership structure." Permits Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt Vertical Homeownership Structure Code to govern construction of vertical homeownership structures. Requires department, if department establishes code, to also develop uniform permitting system and inspection checklist for vertical homeownership structures. Transfers master builder program from Department of Consumer and Business Services to Construction Contractors Board and permits board to establish master builder certification program for vertical homeownership structures. Permits State Board of Architect Examiners and State Board of Examiners for Engineering and Land Surveying to establish certification programs for architects and engineers that will design or participate in constructing vertical homeownership structures. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vertical homeownership structures; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback