OR SB802 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows person who is at least 16 years of age to register to vote.
Title
Relating to the age of voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 468, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 12--Barreto, Esquivel, Hack, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Whisnant; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Barker, Huffman, Piluso, Stark. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-23 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |