OR SB8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments to allow development of certain affordable housing on lands not zoned for residential uses. Requires local governments to allow development of certain affordable housing on lands not zoned for residential uses. Allows establishment of certain affordable housing at increased density. Expands availability of attorney fees for applicants developing affordable housing and local governments prevailing at Land Use Board of Appeals or on appeal from board.
Title
Relating to land use planning for housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 385, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson. |
2021-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 3--Bonham, Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |