OR SB8 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires local governments to allow development of certain affordable housing on lands not zoned for residential uses. Requires local governments to allow development of certain affordable housing on lands not zoned for residential uses. Allows establishment of certain affordable housing at increased density. Expands availability of attorney fees for applicants developing affordable housing and local governments prevailing at Land Use Board of Appeals or on appeal from board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to land use planning for housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-07-07SenateChapter 385, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-23SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-08SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 3--Bonham, Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Housing.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-21SenateGirod declared potential conflict of interest.
2021-04-21SenateThird reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-19SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB8
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB8/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB8/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB8/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB8/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB8/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB8/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31890
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=517151
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32674
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527346
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528377

Bill Comments 750

feedback