OR SB796 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to issue Oregon Wounded Warrior parking permits to qualified applicants. Defines "wounded warrior." Permits person issued Oregon Wounded Warrior parking permit or person transporting person issued parking permit to park motor vehicle in any public parking zone restricted as to length of time permitted therein without incurring overtime penalties and to park motor vehicle in any public parking zone with metered parking without being required to pay any parking meter fee. Provides exceptions. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Oregon Wounded Warrior parking permits; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |