OR SB794 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to design question allowing each student to identify whether student is parent or person acting as parent or legal guardian that will be placed on one or more forms used on annual basis to collect demographic information by public post-secondary institutions of education. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to design question allowing each student to identify whether student is parent or person acting as parent or legal guardian that will be placed on all forms used] one or more forms used on annual basis to collect demographic information by public post-secondary institutions of education. Requires each public post-secondary institution of education to make data available to commission. Requires commission to establish format and time frame for collection and reporting of demographic data, to evaluate public post-secondary institution of education compliance with collecting and providing data and to report to each regular session of Legislative Assembly on status of collecting and providing data.
Title
Relating to student demographic data at post-secondary institutions of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rescinding of the subsequent referral denied by Order of the President. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |