OR SB79 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants and technical assistance to organizations increasing homeownership program access to persons of color. Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants and loans to individuals for down payment assistance and grants, loans] and technical assistance to organizations increasing homeownership program access to persons of color. Allows department to define "persons of color" by rule. Authorizes expending Home Ownership Assistance Account funds for those purposes.] Makes Oregon Housing Fund and subaccounts available to federally recognized Indian tribes that own land in this state. Amends uses of Home Ownership Assistance Account.
Title
Relating to housing disparities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 170, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bynum, Drazan. |
2021-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |