OR SB79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Department of Revenue may assist certain public bodies in collecting delinquent accounts, subject to certain limitations. Provides that Department of Revenue may assist certain public bodies , public universities and Oregon Health and Science University] in collecting delinquent accounts, subject to certain limitations.
Title
Relating to the Collections Unit of the Department of Revenue.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 359, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-18 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue. |
2019-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--President Courtney, Thomsen. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |