OR SB789 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that only certain districts claiming exception from requirement to offer benefits provided and administered by Oregon Educators Benefit Board must undergo actuarial analysis by board to maintain exception.
Title
Relating to Oregon Educators Benefit Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 780, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 14--Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, Richardson, Sprenger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2013-06-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, Olsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 14; nays, 16--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |