OR SB786 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands crime of trafficking in persons to include children for purpose of engaging in commercial sex acts.
Title
Relating to trafficking of persons under 18 years of age; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Brent Barton [D] | Rep. Vicki Berger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |