OR SB780 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board to establish pilot program allowing public employees to obtain health services from coordinated care organizations. Directs Public Employees' Benefit Board, Oregon Educators Benefit Board, Oregon Health Authority and Department of Consumer and Business Services to establish pilot program to consolidate health care coverage under health benefit plans offered by boards with coverage under state medical assistance program. Specifies requirements for pilot program. Requires authority and department to report on pilot program to committees of Legislative Assembly related to health care in 2021, 2023 and 2025. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to coordinated care organizations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |