OR SB779 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes date of certain elections from third Tuesday in May to first Tuesday in March. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to date of election; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. John Lively [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB779 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB779/Introduced |