OR SB772 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires individual and group health insurance policies to reimburse services provided by naturopathic physicians within scope of their practice if services are reimbursed when provided by licensed physicians. Requires individual and group health insurance policies to reimburse services provided by naturopathic physicians within scope of their practice if services are reimbursed when provided by licensed physicians. Requires reimbursement paid to naturopathic physician in independent practice to be in same amount as reimbursement paid to physician. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to naturopathic physicians; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |