OR SB769 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires owner or person in possession or control of solar project to file, on or before December 31 preceding first property tax year to which agreement with county for payment of fee in lieu of property taxes on solar project property relates, nameplate capacity of project and copy of agreement with county assessor and Department of Revenue. Provides that request for computation of fee in lieu of property taxes for property constituting solar project may not be filed after April 1 immediately preceding property tax year to which request relates.] Requires annual filing thereafter, by owner or person in possession or control of solar project, of nameplate capacity with central assessment statement. Requires department, when certifying central assessment roll, to provide nameplate capacity of each solar project to respective county assessor. Requires county assessor to place all fees in lieu of property taxes upon tax roll for distribution pursuant to percentage schedule. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the administration of fees in lieu of property taxes assessed against solar projects; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, September 29, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 628, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 2--Bynum, Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Olsen. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |