OR SB766 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to award noncompetitive grants through Illegal Marijuana Market Enforcement Grant Program to Department of State Police for specified purposes related to unlawful marijuana cultivation or distribution operations. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to award noncompetitive grants through Illegal Marijuana Market Enforcement Grant Program to Department of State Police for specified purposes related to unlawful marijuana cultivation or distribution operations. Specifies that other grants awarded through program are awarded on competitive basis. Appropriates moneys to commission for specified purposes. Appropriates moneys to Department of Justice for specified purposes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cannabis; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-22SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-03-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-16SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-23SenateReferred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB766
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB766/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB766/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB766/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22663
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23013
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23224
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75863
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76251
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66854
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75872
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76063
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262247
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262128
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263062
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263020
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262371
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265264
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265353
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265263
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34625

Bill Comments

feedback