OR SB766 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies date of expiration of sexual abuse restraining order for orders entered when petitioner was under 18 years of age. Modifies date of expiration of sexual abuse restraining order for orders entered when petitioner was under 18 years of age. Specifies procedures when service on respondent of sexual abuse restraining order is completed by alternative service. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sexual abuse restraining orders; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Patterson, Thatcher.
2021-04-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback