OR SB766 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies date of expiration of sexual abuse restraining order for orders entered when petitioner was under 18 years of age. Modifies date of expiration of sexual abuse restraining order for orders entered when petitioner was under 18 years of age. Specifies procedures when service on respondent of sexual abuse restraining order is completed by alternative service. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sexual abuse restraining orders; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 496, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Patterson, Thatcher. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |