OR SB765 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent provisions allowing notary public to perform notarial act using communication technology for remotely located individual under certain circumstances. Makes permanent provisions allowing notary public to perform notarial act using communication technology for remotely located individual under certain circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to notaries; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 344, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 6--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Owens, Post, Reschke, Weber; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |