OR SB764 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that court must presume that resolution agreement that ends dispute over alleged infringement of patent or violation of other protection for protected drug has anticompetitive effects if alleged infringer receives item of value as part of or in connection with resolution agreement or if alleged infringer agrees to limit or stop researching, developing, manufacturing, marketing or selling competing drug. Provides that Attorney General and] court must presume that resolution agreement that ends dispute over alleged infringement of patent or violation of other protection for protected drug has anticompetitive effects if alleged infringer receives item of value as part of or in connection with resolution agreement or if alleged infringer agrees to limit or stop researching, developing, manufacturing, marketing or selling competing drug. Specifies basis on which party to resolution agreement may overcome presumption. Provides that Attorney General may bring action to recover civil penalty for violations of Act in amount that is equivalent to three times value of item of value that alleged infringer received or $10 million per violation, whichever is greater. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.].
Title
Relating to agreements that lead to anticompetitive behavior in the market for pharmaceutical drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-06-02 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion to refer to Committee on Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 17--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |