OR SB763 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person may not engage in business as pharmaceutical representative without obtaining license from Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services. Provides that person may not engage in business as pharmaceutical representative without obtaining license from Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services. Specifies application requirements and procedures, required qualifications of] professional educational requirements for licensee and basis on which director may issue, renew or reinstate license. Prescribes certain duties of and] Prohibits certain actions by licensee. Enables director to punish violations of Act by suspending ,] or revoking or refusing to renew or reinstate] license and by imposing civil penalty of not less than $1,000 and not more than $3,000 for violation of Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to licensing pharmaceutical representatives; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 593, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 20--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde. |
2021-06-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |