OR SB761 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands pilot program for urban deer population control to include elk. Expands pilot program for urban deer population control to include elk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to elk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 144, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-01SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-25SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Levy. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 8--Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Gomberg, Neron, Pham, Schouten, Sollman; Excused, 8--Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Holvey, Moore-Green, Noble, Power, Sanchez, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis.
2021-05-19HouseCarried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-17HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2021-04-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-12SenateThird reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--President Courtney, Riley, Wagner; Excused, 2--Heard, Thomsen.
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-29SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-03-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback