OR SB758 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prescribes timelines and redacting requirements for records related to provision of special education. Prescribes timelines and redacting requirements for records related to provision of special education. Provides that school district bears burden of proof related to special education and determinations and appropriateness regarding identification, evaluation, individualized education program or educational placement and provision of free appropriate public education.] Prohibits school district from preventing or discouraging school employee or volunteer from taking certain actions related to special education and violation of related laws. Prohibits certain nondisclosure agreements between school district and student, parent, school employee or school volunteer related to provision of special education. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sharing of information related to special education; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2023-06-14SenateChapter 189, 2023 Laws.
2023-06-07SenateGovernor signed.
2023-06-01HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-05-30SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Cate, Morgan; Excused, 3--Evans, Osborne, Sosa; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis.
2023-05-23HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-22HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar.
2023-05-16HouseSecond reading.
2023-05-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-10HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to Education.
2023-04-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2023-04-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-04-10SenateCarried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateCarried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-03SenateSecond reading.
2023-03-31SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-28SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-23SenateReferred to Education.
2023-01-19SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB758
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB758/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB758/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB758/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB758/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22940
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23246
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23247
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23463
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76804
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77290
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66847
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76794
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76843
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265176
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264657
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268009
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268010
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267605
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272304
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/272596
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273143
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273150
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273151
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79350
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34871
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=572407
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35727
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=581819

Bill Comments

feedback