OR SB758 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes "Oregon Medical Marijuana Act" to "Oregon Medical and Therapeutic Cannabis Act." Allows person designated to produce marijuana by registry identification cardholder to enter into agreement with registry identification cardholder to transfer marijuana to another registry identification cardholder or primary caregiver. Changes "Oregon Medical Marijuana Act" to "Oregon Medical and Therapeutic Cannabis Act." Allows person designated to produce marijuana by registry identification cardholder to enter into agreement with registry identification cardholder to transfer marijuana to another registry identification cardholder or primary caregiver. Directs Oregon Health Authority to adopt policies and make public statement regarding equitable access to marijuana for medical use.] Allows medical marijuana dispensary and recreational marijuana retailer to transfer marijuana to individual who holds valid out-of-state medical marijuana patient card. Requires authority to ensure cybersecurity of personally identifiable information in authority databases and electronic systems.] Exempts out-of-state medical marijuana patient from taxation on retail sale of marijuana items. Specifies health care providers who may recommend medical use of marijuana to registry identification cardholder. Provides that Oregon Health Authority may not charge fee greater than $20 for registry identification card for certain individuals. Directs authority to issue permanent registry identification card to individual with lifetime debilitating medical condition. Requires organizations designated as primary caregivers to allow consumption of marijuana for medical use.] Removes criminal records check requirements for applicants for authority registration. Provides that certain marijuana grow sites are not subject to tracking requirements or marijuana plant limits]. Requires marijuana retailers and medical marijuana dispensaries to make available online terpene testing results.] Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to establish care and accommodation program to ensure long-term access to marijuana products for registry identification cardholders. Allows certain recreational marijuana processors to receive marijuana from medical marijuana grow site for purposes of processing marijuana.] Requires distribution of moneys from Oregon Marijuana Account for purposes of administering medical marijuana program. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Directs authority to issue permanent registry identification card to individual with lifetime debilitating medical condition. Requires marijuana retailers and medical marijuana dispensaries to make available online terpene testing results. Becomes operative June 1, 2022. Directs authority to adopt policies and make public statement regarding equitable access to marijuana for medical use. Requires authority to ensure cybersecurity of personally identifiable information in authority databases and electronic systems. Becomes operative September 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to medical marijuana; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |