OR SB757 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits availability of conditional enrollment in Central Background Registry to individuals who have successfully completed criminal background check in Oregon and, if applicable, in state of residence. Limits availability of conditional enrollment in Central Background Registry to individuals who have successfully completed criminal background check in Oregon and, if applicable, in state of residence. Modifies definition of "exempt prohibited individual" to include individuals whose certification or registration has been revoked or whose enrollment in Central Background Registry has been removed only if revocation or removal was for cause. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Owens. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 4--Clem, Drazan, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Bynum, Campos, Rayfield, Salinas, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-19SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen.
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-04-06SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-01SenateWork Session not held.
2021-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback