OR SB757 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits availability of conditional enrollment in Central Background Registry to individuals who have successfully completed criminal background check in Oregon and, if applicable, in state of residence. Limits availability of conditional enrollment in Central Background Registry to individuals who have successfully completed criminal background check in Oregon and, if applicable, in state of residence. Modifies definition of "exempt prohibited individual" to include individuals whose certification or registration has been revoked or whose enrollment in Central Background Registry has been removed only if revocation or removal was for cause. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to children; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 343, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Owens. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 4--Clem, Drazan, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Bynum, Campos, Rayfield, Salinas, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session not held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |