OR SB756 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Environmental Quality to award grant under ORS 454.779 and cover administrative costs necessary to implement ORS 454.779. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to on-site septic system financing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |