OR SB754 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, August 9, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates offense of selling tobacco products or inhalant delivery systems to person under 21 years of age. Punishes violation by fine. Specifies that manager or other person who supervises retail sale of tobacco products or inhalant delivery systems commits offense if person is acting within course and scope of person's employment and person has supervisory authority over person who makes sale. Specifies that owner of business that sells tobacco products or inhalant delivery systems at retail commits violation if sale occurs at business. Raises minimum age at which person may purchase tobacco products and inhalant delivery systems to 21 years of age. Adjusts certain other requirements related to tobacco products and inhalant delivery systems to reflect raised minimum age. Applies to conduct occurring on or after January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to products that have a minimum age requirement for purchase; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenateEffective date, August 9, 2017.
2017-08-11SenateChapter 701, 2017 Laws.
2017-08-09SenateGovernor signed.
2017-07-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2017-07-06HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Evans, Hayden, Smith DB.
2017-07-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Vial. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 20--Barker, Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Evans, Hack, Hayden, Heard, McLane, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone.
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar.
2017-07-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
2017-05-23HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-22HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-18HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-17HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-15HouseSecond reading.
2017-05-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-05-10HouseWork Session held.
2017-04-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Health Care.
2017-03-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-03-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 3--Boquist, DeBoer, Thatcher.
2017-03-22SenateCarried over to 03-23 by unanimous consent.
2017-03-20SenateTaken from 03-20 Calendar and placed on 03-22 Calendar on voice vote.
2017-03-16SenateSecond reading.
2017-03-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-03-14SenateWork Session held.
2017-02-14SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Health Care.
2017-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB754
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB754/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB754/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB754/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB754/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB754/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB754/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24695
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=394441
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25843
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26684
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421779
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421855

Bill Comments

feedback