OR SB752 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that defendant's reasonable belief that victim consented constitutes affirmative defense in certain prosecutions for sexual abuse in the second degree and sexual abuse in the third degree. Provides that defendant's reasonable belief that victim consented constitutes affirmative defense in certain prosecutions for sexual abuse in the second degree and sexual abuse in the third degree. Provides that person convicted of sexual abuse in the second degree is not required to report as sex offender in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sexual abuse offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 6--Breese-Iverson, Leif, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Evans, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher.
2021-04-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-31SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-17SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback