OR SB75 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes civil action against surety for victim injured by felony defendant while on security release. Establishes civil action against surety for victim injured by felony defendant while on security release. Provides exception for surety that is immediate family member of defendant.
Title
Relating to security release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Meek, Prozanski, Sollman. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Judiciary failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Hansell. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |