OR SB749 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires residential care referral agent to be registered with Department of Human Services. Requires residential care referral agent to be registered with Department of Human Services. Imposes certain requirements on residential care referral agents. Makes residential care referral agent mandatory reporter of child abuse. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential care referrals; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 590, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bonham. |
2021-06-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |