OR SB748 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt carbon pollution permit program by rule. Requires commission to consult with certain interested persons and be advised by advisory committee in adopting rules. Establishes Carbon Pollution Permit Program Oversight Committee. Declares legislative purposes of carbon pollution permit program. Provides for distribution of moneys received from fees and penalties under carbon pollution permit program. Establishes Climate Investments Account in State Highway Fund. Establishes Climate Assistance Fund, Oregon Climate Investments Fund and Just Transition Fund. Provides for uses of moneys in funds established. Establishes certain committees and proscribes duties of committees related to uses of moneys in funds established. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Authorizes Environmental Quality Commission and Oregon Business Development Department to adopt rules prior to operative date. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to entities that contribute to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-03-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2017-02-07SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback