OR SB746 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes unlawful practice for place of public accommodation to refuse to accept United States coins or currency as payment for goods and services. Makes unlawful practice for place of public accommodation to refuse to accept United States coins or currency as payment for goods and services. Creates limited exceptions. Allows person to file complaint with Commissioner of Bureau of Labor and Industries alleging unlawful practice against operator or person acting on behalf of place of public accommodation. Becomes operative on July 1, 2022. Limits authority of school district to become member of voluntary organization that administers interscholastic activities unless organization implements policy that prohibits discrimination based on race, color or national origin. Clarifies meaning of race to include natural hair, hair texture, hair type and protective hairstyles for purposes of prohibited discrimination under antidiscrimination statutes. Clarifies that valid dress code or policy may not have disproportionate adverse impact on members of protected class.
Title
Relating to discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB746 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB746/Introduced |