OR SB743 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires, for purposes of calculating district extended ADMw for State School Fund distributions, calculation for virtual public charter school to be separate from calculation for school district if, compared to previous school year, school district has decreasing enrollment. Requires, for purposes of calculating district extended ADMw for State School Fund distributions, calculation for virtual public charter school to be separate from calculation for school district if, compared to previous school year, school district has decreasing enrollment. Modifies calculation of district extended ADMw for school district that is sponsor of virtual public charter school with decreasing enrollment for 2021-2022 or 2022-2023 school year. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to State School Fund calculations for virtual public charter schools; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 494, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Zika. |
2021-06-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-06-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kennemer. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |