OR SB742 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limits local government regulations on certain nonresidential alarm systems and battery-charged fences. Limits local government regulations on certain nonresidential alarm systems and battery-charged fences. Requires signage for battery-charged fences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alarms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-06SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-30SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-25SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback