OR SB742 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limits local government regulations on certain nonresidential alarm systems and battery-charged fences. Limits local government regulations on certain nonresidential alarm systems and battery-charged fences. Requires signage for battery-charged fences.
Title
Relating to alarms.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. |
2021-05-17 | House | Third reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |