OR SB741 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals sunset on and obsolete reporting requirement for Central Oregon Health Council. Repeals sunset on and obsolete reporting requirement for Central Oregon Health Council.
Title
Relating to Central Oregon Health Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 283, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 55; Absent, 1--Meek; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Thomsen. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |