OR SB737 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for property tax exemption for low income rental housing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax exemptions for affordable housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Tax Expenditures. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |