OR SB732 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates offense of selling tobacco products or tobacco product devices to person under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum $2,000 fine. Raises minimum age at which person may purchase or possess tobacco products and tobacco product devices to 21 years of age. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to age requirement for use of inhalants; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-04-15SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-06SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2015-02-26SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback