OR SB731 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to tribal police officers. Modifies provisions relating to tribal police officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tribal police officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 8--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Lewis, Moore-Green, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-28SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer.
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback