OR SB725 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies charges, convictions, arrests, deferred sentences, conditional discharges, referrals for diversion programs and pending indictments that may not be considered in fitness determinations. Specifies charges, or] convictions, arrests, deferred sentences, conditional discharges, referrals for diversion programs and pending indictments that may not be considered in fitness determinations. Specifies types of licenses, certifications or employment for which conviction of certain crimes or charges, arrests, conditional discharges, referrals for diversion programs, deferred sentences or pending indictments regarding certain crimes are] may be disqualifying. Prohibits Oregon Health Authority or Department of Human Services from conducting criminal records checks on long term care and support service providers more than once in every two-year period except under stated conditions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to background checks of individuals who provide care; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Human Services be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Hansell.
2019-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem.
2019-05-30HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
2019-05-29HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-05-21HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-04-30HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters.
2019-04-25SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-24SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2019-04-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Human Services be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-05SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Judiciary, then Human Services.
2019-01-29SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB725
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB725/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB725/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB725/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB725/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB725/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB725/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28737
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=462423
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29630
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=471200
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472536

Bill Comments

feedback