OR SB722 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides state-funded program to pay unemployment benefits to employees of United States and active duty members of Armed Forces of United States who are required to perform service without compensation due to lapse of federal appropriations and who would otherwise be eligible for unemployment compensation for federal employees or ex-servicemembers under federal law. Authorizes Director of Employment Department to prescribe rules that provide individual may not be excluded from being deemed unemployed solely because of service performed for employing unit under legal compulsion for which individual has not received pay on individual's regular payday. Provides that individual continues to be deemed unemployed until earlier of date on which individual begins to receive payment on regular payday or individual permanently ceases work for employing unit.] Provides state-funded program to pay unemployment benefits to individuals on active duty in U.S. Coast Guard and stationed in this state who are legally compelled to provide regular service in U.S. Coast Guard] employees of United States and active duty members of Armed Forces of United States who are required to perform service without receiving] compensation due to lapse of federal appropriations and who would otherwise be eligible for unemployment compensation for federal employees or ex-servicemembers under federal law. Appropriates moneys to Employment Department for purposes of paying benefits and costs necessary] incurred by department to administer benefit program. Provides that back pay shall be considered earnings in determining benefits payable to individual for period for which back pay has been or is paid. Permits Director of Employment Department to use additional methods for recovering benefits erroneously paid to claimant through no fault of claimant and requires director to waive recovery of such overpaid benefits if recovery would be against equity and good conscience. Requires director to make reasonable efforts to advise new claimants for benefits of procedures for recovery of benefits paid in error. Prohibits reduction of back pay paid or awarded to an individual to reflect benefits that individual received during period for which back pay was paid or awarded. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to government benefits; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Workforce by Order of the President, with a subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Workforce by order of the President then to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |